Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB426 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024