Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 80 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Vetoed 05/01/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Luttrell, Ranson, Alonso-Sandoval, Fugate, Swope, Waldron, Deck, Bashore, Hefner, Menz, Manger, Munson, Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer, Pae, Rosecrants, Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|