Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Remove Senator Montgomery as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Seifried
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative ODonnell
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|