Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB435 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2023