Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB450 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44 Req. No. 1451 Page 1 1
55 2
66 3
77 4
88 5
99 6
1010 7
1111 8
1212 9
1313 10
1414 11
1515 12
1616 13
1717 14
1818 15
1919 16
2020 17
2121 18
2222 19
2323 20
2424 21
2525 22
2626 23
2727 24
2828 1
2929 2
3030 3
3131 4
3232 5
3333 6
3434 7
3535 8
3636 9
3737 10
3838 11
3939 12
4040 13
4141 14
4242 15
4343 16
4444 17
4545 18
4646 19
4747 20
4848 21
4949 22
5050 23
5151 24
5252
5353 STATE OF OKLAHOMA
5454
5555 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023)
5656
5757 SENATE BILL 450 By: Hicks
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262
6363 AS INTRODUCED
6464
6565 An Act relating to vulnerable adults; amending 43A
6666 O.S. 2021, Section 10 -111.1, which relates to the
6767 Vulnerable Adult Abuse, Neglect and E xploitation
6868 Report; transferring responsibility of the report;
6969 requiring monthly updates; requiring certain format;
7070 directing certain dis tribution of report; and
7171 providing an effective date .
7272
7373
7474
7575
7676
7777 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA :
7878 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 43A O.S. 2021, Section 10 -111.1,
7979 is amended to read as follows:
8080 Section 10-111.1. A. On or before January 1, 2019, the Office
8181 of the Attorney General sha ll promulgate and maintain the Vulnerable
8282 Adult Abuse, Neglect and Exploitation Report, accessible to the
8383 public on the Internet in an electronic format that is easily and
8484 readily searchable.
8585 B. The report created in subsection A of this section shall be
8686 maintained by the Office of the Attorney General an d shall include a
8787 list of defendants who have been prosecuted by t he Office of the
8888 Attorney General and have been found guilty by a court of law for
8989
9090
9191 Req. No. 1451 Page 2 1
9292 2
9393 3
9494 4
9595 5
9696 6
9797 7
9898 8
9999 9
100100 10
101101 11
102102 12
103103 13
104104 14
105105 15
106106 16
107107 17
108108 18
109109 19
110110 20
111111 21
112112 22
113113 23
114114 24
115115 1
116116 2
117117 3
118118 4
119119 5
120120 6
121121 7
122122 8
123123 9
124124 10
125125 11
126126 12
127127 13
128128 14
129129 15
130130 16
131131 17
132132 18
133133 19
134134 20
135135 21
136136 22
137137 23
138138 24
139139
140140 abuse, exploitation or neglect of elderly or vulnerable adults in
141141 the preceding twelve (12) months. The re port shall be provided to
142142 the Governor, the Speaker of the House o f Representatives and the
143143 President Pro Tempore of the Senate on an annual basis beginning
144144 January 31, 2019. The report shall include, but not be limited to:
145145 1. The name of the defendant;
146146 2. The crime for which the defendant was convicted;
147147 3. A description of the findings of abuse, neglect or
148148 exploitation by the Office of the Attorney General, including the
149149 circumstances surrounding the a buse;
150150 4. The date of conviction or the date that a plea of guilty or
151151 nolo contendere was accepted by the court;
152152 5. The relationship of the defendant to the victim; and
153153 6. The county where the offense or offenses occurred.
154154 C. On or before January 1, 202 4, the Office of the Attorney
155155 General shall transfe r the responsibility and maintenance of the
156156 report required in sub section A of this section to the Oklahoma
157157 State Bureau of Investigation. The Bureau shall collect the
158158 necessary data from the courts, the Attorney General and local law
159159 enforcement in order to provide accurate and timely information to
160160 the public via the required website and report.
161161 D. The website shall be updated with current conviction
162162 information monthly. The information required to be included on the
163163 website, pursuant to the provisions of this act, shall be presented
164164
165165
166166 Req. No. 1451 Page 3 1
167167 2
168168 3
169169 4
170170 5
171171 6
172172 7
173173 8
174174 9
175175 10
176176 11
177177 12
178178 13
179179 14
180180 15
181181 16
182182 17
183183 18
184184 19
185185 20
186186 21
187187 22
188188 23
189189 24
190190 1
191191 2
192192 3
193193 4
194194 5
195195 6
196196 7
197197 8
198198 9
199199 10
200200 11
201201 12
202202 13
203203 14
204204 15
205205 16
206206 17
207207 18
208208 19
209209 20
210210 21
211211 22
212212 23
213213 24
214214
215215 in such a way to be clear and concise in a manner which is easily
216216 understandable.
217217 E. The Bureau shall provide an annual report of the website
218218 findings to the Governor, the Speaker of the House of
219219 Representatives, and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate
220220 beginning on January 31, 2024.
221221 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2023.
222222
223223 59-1-1451 BG 1/17/2023 10:00:45 AM