Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB450 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 1451 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 450 	By: Hicks 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to vulnerable adults; amending 43A 
O.S. 2021, Section 10 -111.1, which relates to the 
Vulnerable Adult Abuse, Neglect and E xploitation 
Report; transferring responsibility of the report; 
requiring monthly updates; requiring certain format; 
directing certain dis tribution of report; and 
providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA : 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     43A O.S. 2021, Section 10 -111.1, 
is amended to read as follows: 
Section 10-111.1. A.  On or before January 1, 2019, the Office 
of the Attorney General sha ll promulgate and maintain the Vulnerable 
Adult Abuse, Neglect and Exploitation Report, accessible to the 
public on the Internet in an electronic format that is easily and 
readily searchable. 
B.  The report created in subsection A of this section shall be 
maintained by the Office of the Attorney General an d shall include a 
list of defendants who have been prosecuted by t he Office of the 
Attorney General and have been found guilty by a court of law for   
 
 
Req. No. 1451 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
abuse, exploitation or neglect of elderly or vulnerable adults in 
the preceding twelve (12) months.  The re port shall be provided to 
the Governor, the Speaker of the House o f Representatives and the 
President Pro Tempore of the Senate on an annual basis beginning 
January 31, 2019.  The report shall include, but not be limited to: 
1.  The name of the defendant; 
2.  The crime for which the defendant was convicted; 
3.  A description of the findings of abuse, neglect or 
exploitation by the Office of the Attorney General, including the 
circumstances surrounding the a buse; 
4.  The date of conviction or the date that a plea of guilty or 
nolo contendere was accepted by the court; 
5.  The relationship of the defendant to the victim; and 
6.  The county where the offense or offenses occurred. 
C.  On or before January 1, 202 4, the Office of the Attorney 
General shall transfe r the responsibility and maintenance of the 
report required in sub section A of this section to the Oklahoma 
State Bureau of Investigation.  The Bureau shall collect the 
necessary data from the courts, the Attorney General and local law 
enforcement in order to provide accurate and timely information to 
the public via the required website and report. 
D.  The website shall be updated with current conviction 
information monthly.  The information required to be included on the 
website, pursuant to the provisions of this act, shall be presented   
 
 
Req. No. 1451 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
in such a way to be clear and concise in a manner which is easily 
understandable. 
E.  The Bureau shall provide an annual report of the website 
findings to the Governor, the Speaker of the House of 
Representatives, and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate 
beginning on January 31, 2024. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
59-1-1451 BG 1/17/2023 10:00:45 AM