Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Vetoed 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
SCs named Garvin, Pemberton, Jett, Daniels, Paxton, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hays
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Montgomery; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Amended by Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|