Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Vetoed 03/29/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
HAs adopted AYES: 31 NAYS: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson, Burns
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Grego, Cantrell, Nichols, Echols, Talley, Strom
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Stark
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Woods
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace, Townley, Pfeiffer, Stark, Lowe (Dick), Archer, Bennett, Moore, Fetgatter, McDugle, McBride, Martinez, Kerbs
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Withdrawn from Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|