Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB458 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2024
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2023