Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB468 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024