Senate | 05/01/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader |