Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck, Conley
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Remove Representative Boles as principal House author and substitute with Representative McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|