Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB484 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023