Senate | 05/02/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard |