Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023