Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Woods, Kidd, Hall, Paxton, Jech, Boren, Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|