Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023