Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Daniels | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |