Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2023