Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/05/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 27
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Pugh, Treat, Pemberton, Thompson (Kristen), Boren
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Brooks
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|