Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB519 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024