House | 04/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Stanley | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh |