Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 28; Ayes: 51 Nays: 28
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SCs named Pugh, Seifried, Daniels, Rader, Thompson (Kristen), Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 19; Ayes: 52 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|