Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vetoed 04/26/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino |