Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023