Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023