Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/31/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|