Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023