Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Montgomery; authored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|