House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh |