Senate | 04/28/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 8 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Seifried |