Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023