Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023