Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Bashore
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Banning
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
remove as principal author Representative Boatman and substitute with Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope, Munson
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|