Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB58 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023