Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB599 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 612 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 599 	By: Montgomery 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to vital records; amendin g 63 O.S. 
2021, Section 1-317, as last amended by Section 1, 
Chapter 184, O.S.L. 2022 (63 O. S. Supp. 2022, Section 
1-317), which relates to death certifica tes; 
lengthening time period for certain requirements; 
providing for disciplinary penalties; and providing 
an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     63 O.S. 2021, Section 1 -317, as 
last amended by Section 1, Chapter 184, O.S.L. 2022 (63 O.S. Supp. 
2022, Section 1-317), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 1-317. A.  A death certificate for each dea th which 
occurs in this state shall be filed with the State Department of 
Health, within three (3) days after such death. 
B.  The funeral director shall personally sign the death 
certificate and shall be respo nsible for filing the death 
certificate.  If the funeral director is not available, the person 
acting as such who first assumes custody of a dead body in 
accordance with Sectio n 1158 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statutes   
 
 
Req. No. 612 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
shall personally sign and file the d eath certificate.  The personal 
data shall be obtained from the next of kin or the best qualified 
person or source available.  The certificate shall be completed as 
to personal data and delivered to the attending physician or the 
medical examiner responsib le for completing the medical 
certification portion of the certificate of death within twenty -four 
(24) hours after the death.  No later than July 1, 2012, the 
personal data, and no later than July 1, 2017, the medical 
certificate portion, shall be entered into the prescribed electronic 
system provided by the State Registrar of Vital Statistics and the 
information submitted to the State Registrar of Vital Statistics.  
The resultant certificate produced by the electronic system shall be 
provided to the physi cian or medical examiner for medical 
certification within twenty-four (24) hours after the death. 
C.  The medical certification shall be completed and signed 
within forty-eight (48) hours fourteen (14) calendar days after 
death by the physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice 
registered nurse in charge of the patient ’s care for the illness or 
condition which resulted in death, except when inquiry as to the 
cause of death is required by Section 938 of this title.  No later 
than July 1, 2017, the m edical certification portion of certificate 
data shall be entered into the prescribed electronic system provided 
by the State Registrar of Vital Statistics and the information 
submitted to the State Registrar of Vital Statistics.   
 
 
Req. No. 612 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
D.  In the event that the physician, physician assistant, or 
advanced practice registered nurse in ch arge of the patient’s care 
for the illness or condition which resulted in death is not in 
attendance at the time of death, the medical certification shall be 
completed and signed wi thin forty-eight (48) hours fourteen (14) 
calendar days after death by the physician, physician assista nt, or 
advanced practice registered nurse in attendance at the time of 
death, except: 
1.  When the patient is under hospice care at the time of death, 
the medical certification may be signed by the hospic e’s medical 
director; and 
2.  When inquiry as to the cause of death is required by Section 
938 of this title. 
Provided, that such certification, if signed by other than the 
attending physician, physician a ssistant, or advanced practice 
registered nurse, sh all note on the face the name of the attending 
physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice registered 
nurse and that the information shown is only as reported. 
E.  A certifier completing cause of death on a certificate of 
death who knows that a le thal drug, overdose or other means of 
assisting suicide within the meaning of Sections 3141.2 through 
3141.4 of this title ca used or contributed to the death shall list 
that means among the chain of events under cause of death or list it 
in the box that describes how the inju ry occurred.  If such means is   
 
 
Req. No. 612 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
in the chain of events under cause of death or in the box that 
describes how the injury occurred, the certifier shall indicate 
“suicide” as the manner of death. 
F.  The authority of a physician assistant t o carry out the 
functions described in this section shall be governed by the 
practice agreement as provided by Section 519.6 of Title 59 of the 
Oklahoma Statutes. 
G.  Noncompliance with the requirements fo r timely completion 
and signing of a medical certification as provided in this section 
may be grounds for disciplinary action by the licensing board of the 
physician, physician assistant, or Advanced Practice Registered 
Nurse. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
59-1-612 DC 1/17/2023 6:59:50 PM