Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB60 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023