Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB60 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/20/2023

                             
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 60 	By: Daniels of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Kendrix of the House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to professions and occupations; 
amending 59 O.S. 2021, Sectio n 161.4, which relates 
to the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; extending 
sunset date; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergenc y. 
 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  Chiropractors 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S . 2021, Section 161.4, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 161.4. A.  A Board of Chiropractic Examiners is hereby 
re-created to continue until July 1, 2023 2026, in accordance with 
the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law.  The Board shall regulate 
the practice of chiropractic in this state in accordance with th e 
provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act.  The Board, 
appointed by the Governor, shall be composed of eight chiropractic 
physicians and one lay member representing the public. 
 
B.  Each chiropractic physician m ember of the Board shall: 
 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; 
 
2.  Have practiced chiropractic continuously in this state 
during the five (5) y ears immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board;   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 60 	Page 2 
 
3.  Be free of pending discip linary action or active 
investigation by the Board; 
 
4.  Be a person of recognized professional ability, integrity 
and good reputation; and 
 
5.  Be in active clinical chiroprac tic practice at least fifty 
percent (50%) of the time. 
 
C.  The lay member of the B oard shall: 
 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; and 
 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be related within the third degree of co nsanguinity 
or affinity to any such person. 
 
D.  The Governor shall appoint members to the Board and for 
terms of years as follows: 
 
1. Position 1:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 2, 2006, the Governor shall appo int a 
board member from District 1 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2010, and every four ( 4) years thereafter; 
 
2.  Position 2:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2005, the Governor shall app oint a 
board member from District 2 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
 
3.  Position 3:  Upo n expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2007, the Governor shall appoin t a board 
member from District 3 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2011, and every four (4) yea rs thereafter; 
 
4.  Position 4:  Upon expir ation of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 4 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2011, and every four (4) ye ars thereafter; 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 60 	Page 3 
5. Position 5:  Upon expi ration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2008, the Governor shall appoint a bo ard 
member from District 5 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2012, and every four (4) years the reafter; 
 
6.  Position 6:  On June 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 6 for a term of one (1) year to expire on 
June 1, 2006, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
 
7.  Position 7:  On November 1, 200 5, the Governor shall appoint 
a board member from District 7 for a term of three (3) years to 
expire on November 1, 2008, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
 
8.  Position 8: Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from the state at large for a term of four (4) years to 
expire on June 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter; and 
 
9.  Position 9:  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor. 
 
E.  For the purpose of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Ac t, 
the state shall be divided into the following districts: 
 
1.  District 1:  Alfalfa, Beaver, Beckham, Caddo, Cimarron, 
Custer, Dewey, Ellis, Grant, Greer, Garfield, Harmon, Harper, 
Jackson, Kiowa, Major, Noble, Ro ger Mills, Texas, Washita, Woods and 
Woodward Counties; 
 
2.  District 2:  Tulsa County; 
 
3.  District 3:  Kay, Logan, Lincoln, Osage, Pawnee, Payne and 
Pottawatomie Counties; 
 
4.  District 4:  Carter, Comanche, Cotton, Garvin, Gra dy, Love, 
Murray, Jefferson, Stephens and Tillman Counties; 
 
5.  District 5:  Blaine, Canadian, Cleveland, Kingfisher, 
McClain and Oklahoma Counties; 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 60 	Page 4 
6.  District 6:  Atoka, B ryan, Coal, Choctaw, Creek, Hughes, 
Johnston, Latimer, LeFlore Le Flore, Marshall, McCurtain, Okfuskee, 
Pittsburg, Pontotoc, Pushmataha and Seminole Coun ties; and 
 
7.  District 7:  Adair, Cherokee, Craig, Delaware, Haskell, 
Mayes, McIntosh, Muskogee, Nowata, Okmulge e, Ottawa, Rogers, 
Sequoyah, Wagoner and Washington Counties. 
 
Members appointed after June 2002 shall serve no more than two (2) 
consecutive terms. 
 
F.  Each member shall hold office until the expiration of the 
term of office for which appointed or until a qualified successor 
has been duly appointed.  An appointment shall be mad e by the 
Governor within ninety ( 90) days after the expiration of the t erm of 
any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the Board due to 
resignation, death, or any other cause res ulting in an unexpired 
term. 
 
G.  Before assuming duties on the Board, eac h member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided i n Article XV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in the article. 
 
H.  A member may be removed from the Board by the Govern or for 
cause which shall includ e, but not be limited to: 
 
1.  Ceasing to be qualified; 
 
2. Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdiction of a 
felony or any offense involving moral turpitude; 
 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasa nce, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in relation to Board duties; 
 
4.  Being found mentally incompetent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision o f the Oklahoma 
Chiropractic Practice Act; or 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 60 	Page 5 
6.  Failing to attend three meetings of the Board without just 
cause, as determined by the Board. 
 
I.  No member of the Board shall be: 
 
1.  A registered lobbyist; 
 
2.  An officer, board member or employee of a sta tewide 
organization established for the purpose of advocating the interes ts 
of chiropractors licensed pursuant to the Oklahoma Chiropractic 
Practice Act; or 
 
3.  An insurance claims adjuster, reviewer, or consultant; 
provided, however, a person shall not be considered to be a 
consultant solely for testifying in a court as an exp ert witness. 
 
SECTION 2. This act shall become effectiv e July 1, 2023. 
 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect an d 
be in full force from and afte r its passage and approval. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 60 	Page 6 
Passed the Senate the 6th day of March, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 19th day of April, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of t he State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __