House | 04/19/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard |