House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |