Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Vetoed 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Montgomery; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|