Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB631 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2024