Senate | 06/06/2023 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Treat |