Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB688 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023