Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Stephens; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Dugger
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Newhouse, Woods, Standridge
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Prieto, Montgomery, Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Rosecrants, Hardin, McDugle, Bashore, Pae, Randleman
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Randleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Dugger
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Bashore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|