Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Pocket veto 06/11/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Murdock, Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, Paxton, Thompson (Roger), Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|