Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB703 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2023

                             
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 703 	By: Murdock of the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Newton of the House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Administrative Workers ’ 
Compensation Act; amending 85A O.S. 2021, Section 
122, which relates to costs of administering act; 
modifying requirements for payments from Multiple 
Injury Trust Fund; modifying payment amounts; 
updating statutory reference; provi ding an effective 
date; and declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  Workers’ compensation 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     85A O.S. 2021, Section 122, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 122. A.  The Workers’ Compensation Commission Revolving 
Fund established by Section 28.1 of t his title shall be used for the 
costs of administering this act the Administrative Workers ’ 
Compensation Act and for other purposes as aut horized by law. 
 
B.  For the purpose of providing funds for the Workers’ 
Compensation Commission Revolving Fund, for the Workers’ 
Compensation Administrative Fund c reated in Section 401.1 of this 
title, for the Multiple Injury Trust Fund created in Section 28 of 
this title, and to fund other provisions within this title, the 
following tax rates shall apply: 
 
1.  Each mutual or interinsurance association, stock compan y, 
CompSource Mutual Insurance Company or other insurance carrier   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 703 	Page 2 
writing workers’ compensation insurance in this state shall pay to 
the Oklahoma Tax Commission an assessment at a rate of one percent 
(1%) of all gross direct premiums written during each qu arter of the 
calendar year for workers’ compensation insurance on risks located 
in this state after deducting from such gross direct premiums, 
return premiums, unabsorbed portions of any deposit premiums, polic y 
dividends, safety refunds, savings and other similar returns paid or 
credited to policyholders.  Such payments to the Tax Commission 
shall be made not later than the fifteenth day of the month 
following the close of each quarter of the calendar year in w hich 
such gross direct premium is collected or collectible.  
Contributions made by insurance carriers and CompSource Mutual 
Insurance Company, under the provisions of this section, shall be 
considered for the purpose of computing workers ’ compensation rates; 
and 
 
2.  When an employer is authorized to become a self-insurer, the 
Commission shall so notify the Tax Commission, giving the effecti ve 
date of such authorization.  The Tax Commission shall then assess 
and collect from the employers carrying their own risk an assessment 
at the rate of two percent (2%) of the total compensation for 
permanent total disability awards, permanent partial dis ability 
awards and death benefits paid out during each quarter of the 
calendar year by the employers.  Such assessment shall be payable by 
the employers and collect ed by the Tax Commission according to the 
provisions of this section regarding payment and c ollection of the 
assessment created in paragraph 1 of this subsection. 
 
C.  It shall be the duty of the Tax Commission to collect the 
payments provided for in this title.  The Tax Commission is hereby 
authorized to bring an action for the recovery of any d elinquent or 
unpaid payments required in this section.  The Tax Commission may 
also enforce payments by proceeding in ac cordance with the 
provisions of Section 98 o f this title. 
 
D.  The Tax Commission shall pay monthly to the State Treasurer 
to the credit of the Multiple Injury Trust Fund all monies collected 
under the provisions of this section less the annual amounts whic h 
shall be apportioned by the Oklahoma Tax Commission as follows: 
 
1.  Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00) Five Million Five 
Hundred Thousand Dollars ($5,500,000.00) shall be payable each   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 703 	Page 3 
fiscal year in equal monthly installments to the credit of the 
Workers’ Compensation Commission Revolving Fund established in 
Section 28.1 of this title for the fiscal year ending June 30, 20 16, 
Three Million Dollars ($3,000,000.00) for the fiscal year ending 
June 30, 2017, and Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) for the 
fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, and for all subsequent years to be 
used to implement the provisions of this title; and 
 
2. Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) shall be payable in 
equal monthly installments to the credit of the Workers’ 
Compensation Administrative Fund established in Section 40 1.1 of 
this title for the fiscal ye ar ending June 30, 2016, Three Million 
Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($3,500,000.00) for the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2017, Three Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($3,500,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30 , 2018, Three 
Million Dollars ($3,0 00,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 
2019, One Million Seven Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars 
($1,750,000.00) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, One 
Million Seven Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($1,750 ,000.00) shall 
be payable in equal monthly installments to the credit of the 
Workers’ Compensation Administrat ive Fund established i n Section 
401.1 of this title for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 June 
30, 2023, and for all subsequent years dur ing the existence of the 
Court of Existing Claims and Two Hundred Fifty Thousand Doll ars 
($250,000.00) payable in equal monthly installments to the fund for 
the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2023, and each subsequent fiscal 
year. 
 
In the event that the fund in any one month is insufficient to 
make the required paym ents, the unpaid portion shall be paid as soon 
as funds become available. 
 
E. Monies deposited in the Workers’ Compensation Administr ative 
Fund shall be used by the Workers’ Compensation Court of Existing 
Claims to implement provisio ns provided for in thi s title. 
 
E. F.  The refund provisions of Sections 227 through 229 of 
Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes shall be applicable to any 
payments made pursuant to this section. All unencumbered funds 
remaining in the Workers’ Compensation Administrati ve Fund on July 
1, 2027, shall be transferred to the State T reasurer to be returned 
to the Multiple Injur y Trust Fund.   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 703 	Page 4 
 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an e mergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 703 	Page 5 
Passed the Senate the 24th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 25th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __