Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Pederson, Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, Paxton, Brooks, Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote on tabling of bill rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Ayes: 47 Nays: 46
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Motion to table bill adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Dobrinski, Cantrell, Townley, Tedford, Stark, Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Howard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Randleman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|