Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB706 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2023