Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vetoed 04/26/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|